This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:23:45 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ALLIANCE ENERGY COMPANY ET

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALLIANCE ENERGY COMPANY ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, SAMANTHA JESSNER and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4365

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

SAMANTHA JESSNER

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

ALLIANCE ENERGY COMPANY

CHIANG DAVID

CHIANG TZUU PIEN

DOES 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DOWNS & ASSOICATES

KUSHNER MICHAEL FRANKLIN

Other Attorneys

SUN GUODI

HWANG PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

2/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Minute Order

6/5/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION

6/20/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION

Substitution of Attorney

1/7/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

1/7/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Opposition

1/25/2019: Opposition

Declaration

1/29/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

2/13/2019: Unknown

Unknown

2/26/2019: Unknown

Case Management Statement

3/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/20/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

12/20/2016: SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/23/2017: SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST WEN XUE CHANG

1/23/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST WEN XUE CHANG

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/11/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Reply (To Opposition to Motion to Vacate); Filed by Alliance Energy Company (Legacy Party); Tzuu Pien Chiang (Legacy Party); David Chiang (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Status Conference (reBinding Arbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Alliance Energy Company (Legacy Party); Tzuu Pien Chiang (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Alliance Energy Company (Legacy Party); Tzuu Pien Chiang (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE FOR PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC644365    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

Date: 12/20/19

Case: Mid-Century Insurance Co. v. Alliance Energy Company, et al. (BC 644365)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Alliance Energy Company’s and Tzuu Pien Chiang’s Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award is DENIED.

Defendant seek relief pursuant to statutory authority under which the Court may vacate an arbitration award, which this Court has already declined to do previously. Moreover, judgment was entered in this matter on September 30, 2019, and moving defendants cite no authority or grounds for the Court to vacate its judgment.

The Court notes plaintiff’s reference to the imposition of sanctions in its opposition to the instant motion. If plaintiff should find it appropriate in the future to request sanctions in connection with defendants’ future conduct in this litigation, plaintiff should do so pursuant to statutes and legal authority permitting the Court to award or impose sanctions. (See, e.g., CCP §§ 128.5, 128.7)