This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2017 at 22:02:26 (UTC).

MICHELLE POPP , ET AL VS J.P. ELIOPULOS ENTERPRISES, INC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2013 MICHELLE POPP filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against J P ELIOPULOS ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4213

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACOSTA MIGUEL

ADAMS ELIZABETH

ADAMS RONALD

AGUIRRE MARY JANE

BARAHONA CARMEN R

BARRIENTOS MARIA

BASCOS MARIA

BOATRIGHT ARCHIE

BOATRIGHT LAURI

BORILLO GARY

BORILLO ROSAURA

BRANDEL CINDY L

CAIN CHARLES

CAIN PAMELA

CARAPETIAN CHRIS

CASTELLANOS JOSE LUIS

CORONADO STEVE

DAVIS IRENE

DEL FRATE JOHN

FLORES HECTOR J

119 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTELEONE DANIL

Other Attorneys

BUCK RICHARD E.

SARNI KIMBERLY J. ESQ.

EBNER DARREN M.

SHEN MICHAEL H.

DER KENDALL

LAWRENCE LISA I.

LAMOND CHRISTIAN F.

LONGO DAN L.

ARABI ARASH S.

EDIC WILLIAM S.

HAMMONS WALLACE W.

SATRAN JEROME R.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

5/8/2013: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/8/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

6/3/2013: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MAANGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/3/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MAANGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

7/16/2013: SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/6/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Unknown

10/29/2013: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/29/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

11/18/2013: Minute Order

REJECT SHEET

11/19/2013: REJECT SHEET

REJECT SHEET

12/26/2013: REJECT SHEET

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/17/2014: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

REJECT SHEET

1/27/2014: REJECT SHEET

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

1/30/2014: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

1/30/2014: SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/19/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

2/25/2014: Unknown

Unknown

3/3/2014: Unknown

151 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMIN- ATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY XDEFT/XCOMP ARENA LANDSCAPING, INC SIGNED BY JUDGE ROGERS ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. SIGNED BY JUDGE ROGERS ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION OF WESTERN INSULATION LP SIGNED BY JUDGE ROGERS ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION OF MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC FKA SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC DBA PARAGON SCHMID BUILDING PRODUCTS SIGNED BY JUDGE ROGERS) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE XCOMP FILED BY ARENA LANDSCAPING, INC. ON 07/22/14 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (OF LISA I. LAWRENCE IN SUPPORT OF ARENA LANDSCAPING INC'S APPLICA- TION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketApplication - Miscellaneous (FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF ARENA LANDSCAPING INC ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (FOR XDEFT/XCOMP ARENA LANDSCAPING INC ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketOrder (CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PENDING CONSUMMATION OF SETTLEMENT AND CMC TO 03/27/17 SIGNED BY JUDGE ROGERS ) Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketApplication - Miscellaneous (OF MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; SIGNED BY JUDGE RANDOLPH A. ROGERS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (2ND AMENDED COMP REJECTED: NEED A STIPULATION OR NOTICE MOTION ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference (11-18-13 830 ATV11 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF ASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SATRAN, JEROME R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMOND CHRISTIAN F. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK RICHARD E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEN MICHAEL H.