This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 00:03:13 (UTC).

MICHELLE FACUNDO VS ARTA TEQUILA LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2015 MICHELLE FACUNDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARTA TEQUILA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN, DANIEL S. MURPHY and JOHN P. FARRELL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1918

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

DANIEL S. MURPHY

JOHN P. FARRELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FACUNDO MICHELLE

Defendants and Respondents

ARTA TEQUILA LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER A. OLSON

LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER A. CARVER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROSS DIXON & BELL L.L.P.

TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NONPAYMENT OF OVERTIME COMPENSATION ? LAB. CODE, 1194; ETC

5/15/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NONPAYMENT OF OVERTIME COMPENSATION ? LAB. CODE, 1194; ETC

SUMMONS

5/15/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/18/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/28/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/22/2015: DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/22/2015: DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

DECLARATION OF RANDY PIERCE IN SUPPORT OF DFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/22/2015: DECLARATION OF RANDY PIERCE IN SUPPORT OF DFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

8/12/2015: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/7/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/9/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/9/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ANSWER ANI AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT PACIFICA HOLLYWOOD. L.R.

10/9/2015: ANSWER ANI AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT PACIFICA HOLLYWOOD. L.R.

PLAINI?IFL?S OPPOSILION 10 DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MICHELLE FACUND()

10/9/2015: PLAINI?IFL?S OPPOSILION 10 DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MICHELLE FACUND()

DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. STREETER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION

10/16/2015: DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. STREETER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RANDY PIERCE

10/19/2015: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RANDY PIERCE

DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ATRIION AND COMPEL ARHIT RATION

10/19/2015: DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ATRIION AND COMPEL ARHIT RATION

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL

10/19/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; (Conference-Binding Arb. Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; (Conference-Binding Arb. Status; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Arta Tequila, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S STATUS REPORT RE: ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Michelle Facundo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DEFENDANT ARTA TEQUILA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NONPAYMENT OF OVERTIME COMPENSATION LAB. CODE, 1194; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Michelle Facundo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less