This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 21:34:13 (UTC).

MICHELLE BLACKWELL VS WMC MORTGAGE CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2013 MICHELLE BLACKWELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WMC MORTGAGE CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1357

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLACKWELL MICHELLE

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE

Defendants and Respondents

MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I

SECURED FUNDING CORP.

WMC MORTGAGE CORP

WMC MORTGAGE LLC

THE WOLF FIRM

DOES 1 TO 10

I MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPTAL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

DECLARATION OF SIMON M. FENG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IN INTERVENTION WELLS FARGO?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/6/2018: DECLARATION OF SIMON M. FENG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IN INTERVENTION WELLS FARGO?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REPLY TO INTERVENOR'S OPPOSITION TO BLACKWELL'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/10/2018: REPLY TO INTERVENOR'S OPPOSITION TO BLACKWELL'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

RULING RE: PLAINTIFF MICHELLE BLACKWELL'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

9/5/2018: RULING RE: PLAINTIFF MICHELLE BLACKWELL'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal

11/29/2018: Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B292455

5/20/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B292455

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY, VERIFIED,

2/20/2013: COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY, VERIFIED,

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

4/23/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

1/27/2014: Minute Order -

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUCT1ON, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

3/18/2014: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUCT1ON, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

RULING

5/23/2014: RULING

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8/21/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/16/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

9/17/2015: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/12/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

228 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Expungement; and Declaratory Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 11:11 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Ruling Re Plaintiff Michell Blackwell's Motion to Stay); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMotion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by Michelle Blackwell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
421 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Blackwell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Michelle Blackwell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY, VERIFIED,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC501357    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 61

Plaintiff Michell Blackwell’s Motion to Stay is DENIED.

“Trial courts generally have the inherent power to stay proceedings in the interests of justice and to promote judicial efficiency.” (Freiberg v. City of Mission Viejo (1995) 33 Cal.App.4th 1484, 1489.) The decision of a trial court to stay proceedings is thus generally a matter of discretion. (Bains v. Moores (2009) 172 Cal.App.4th 445, 480.)

Blackwell asks this court to stay proceedings in this case because Blackwell is pursuing appeals in the Ninth Circuit and federal district court. (Blackwell Decl. ¶ 10.) But judgment has already been entered in Wells Fargo’s favor. Blackwell points to no proceedings in this case that any stay entered by this court could affect.

The Motion to Stay is DENIED.