This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:36:02 (UTC).

MICHELE GORALNICK VS VANESSA CEVALLOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 MICHELE GORALNICK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against VANESSA CEVALLOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2930

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORALNICK MICHELE

Defendants

GELLER CARMEN

ORNELAS ANA LAURA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

CEVALLOS VANESSA

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPOLIN COHEN & MAINZER LLP

Defendant Attorney

BRANDON SUA & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/1/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

3/9/2017: PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

SUMMONS

6/6/2016: SUMMONS

DEFENDANT VANESSA CEVALLOS' VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MICHELE GORALNICK

8/17/2016: DEFENDANT VANESSA CEVALLOS' VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MICHELE GORALNICK

Minute Order

2/6/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/20/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/28/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM; DECLARATIONS; AND PROPOSED ORDER

2/21/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM; DECLARATIONS; AND PROPOSED ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST

3/9/2017: PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/1/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/21/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON VERIFIED COMPLAINT (LIS PENDENS)

6/6/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON VERIFIED COMPLAINT (LIS PENDENS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/19/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/12/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

3/13/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/20/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/10/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/26/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 72; (MOTION-SET ASIDE; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Stipulation; Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON VANESSA CEVALLOS, CARMEN GELLER AND ANA LAURA ORNELAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON VERIFIED COMPLAINT (LIS PENDENS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON VERIFIED COMPLAINT (LIS PENDENS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Michele Goralnick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER FINANCIAL ABUSE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less