This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:56:24 (UTC).

MICHAELA SHEPPARD VS CENTURY TRANSPORTATION SERVICES ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2016 MICHAELA SHEPPARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CENTURY TRANSPORTATION SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9189

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHEPPARD MICHAELA

Defendants and Respondents

CENTURY TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

WEST COAST AMBULANCE INC.

MINASYAN SERGIK DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOSHARIAN PETER A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

TAHMAZIAN JILBERT ESQ.

MOHAMED CHRISTOPHER J.

TROPP-THOMPSON DEBORAH S.

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/5/2016: Summons

Complaint

5/5/2016: Complaint

WEST COAST AMBULANCE, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND INDEMNIFICATION

3/8/2017: WEST COAST AMBULANCE, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND INDEMNIFICATION

DEFENDANT WEST COAST AMBULANCE, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/8/2017: DEFENDANT WEST COAST AMBULANCE, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

3/8/2017: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/27/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/11/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. II RE: PROHIBITIONS AGAINST VIOLATING STANDARDS OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/30/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. II RE: PROHIBITIONS AGAINST VIOLATING STANDARDS OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS;AND ETC.

5/30/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS;AND ETC.

DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED AND OR VERIFIED BY PLAINTIFF DURING DISCOVERY;AND ETC.

5/30/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED AND OR VERIFIED BY PLAINTIFF DURING DISCOVERY;AND ETC.

DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 FOR AN ORDER LIMITING THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS;AND ETC.

5/30/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 FOR AN ORDER LIMITING THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS;AND ETC.

DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS;AND ETC.

5/30/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS;AND ETC.

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLUDE. THE AMOUNTS CHARGED AND PERMIT ONLY THE INTRODUCTION OF THE AMOUNTS PAID; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL;

5/30/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLUDE. THE AMOUNTS CHARGED AND PERMIT ONLY THE INTRODUCTION OF THE AMOUNTS PAID; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL;

Unknown

6/8/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

12/19/2018: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Unknown

5/6/2019: Unknown

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 05/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998; Filed by Michaela Sheppard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Michaela Sheppard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • DEFENDANT WEST COAST AMBULANCE, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Michaela Sheppard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Century Transportation Services Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CENTURY TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC.; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Michaela Sheppard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC619189    Hearing Date: January 14, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MICHAELA SHEPPARD,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CENTURY TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

BC619189

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

January 14, 2021

On May 5, 2016, Plaintiff Michaela Sheppard filed this action against Defendants Century Transportation Services and West Coast Ambulance, Inc. 

On August 6, 2018, the Court approved an application for determination of good faith settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant West Coast Ambulance, Inc.  

On September 5, 2018, Plaintiff filed a notice of unconditional settlement of the entire case.  

On December 19, 2018, Plaintiff filed her § 998 offer that Defendant Century Transportation Services, Inc. accepted.  

On May 6, 2019, no appearances were made by or for any party for an Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and the Court ordered the Complaint dismissed without prejudice pursuant to California Rule of Court 3.1385.  

On August 10, 2020, Plaintiff filed this motion to set aside the Court’s dismissal pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure § 473(d). Plaintiff’s counsel declares that he did not appear at the May 6, 2019 OSC because he believed the case was closed and the minute order on the dismissal was mailed to his previous office address. (Hosharian Decl., ¶¶ 5-6.)  Plaintiff argues the Motion should be granted so that the Court may retain jurisdiction over the judgment against Defendant Century Transportation Services, Inc. 

Section 473(d) states: The Court may, upon motion of the injured party, or its own motion, correct clerical mistakes in its judgment or orders as entered, so as to conform to the judgment or order directed, and may, on motion of either party after notice to the other party, set aside any void judgment or order.”  

Plaintiff has shown no evidence of a clerical mistake or any void judgment or order No proposed judgment was concurrently filed with the Notice of 998 offer.  The  998 offer states that Plaintiff will file a dismissal with prejudice of this entire action if the offer is accepted.

Plaintiff’s Motion is DENIED. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

14th day of January 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COAST AMBULANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROPP-THOMPSON DEBORAH S.