This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:57:44 (UTC).

MICHAEL SIMEON SMITH VS AMERICAN IDOL PRODUCTIONS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2016 MICHAEL SIMEON SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN IDOL PRODUCTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3000

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SMITH MICHAEL SIMEON

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

19 RECORDINGS INC

19 RECORDINGS LIMITED

19 TV LIMITED

FREMANTLEMEDIA NORTH AMERICA INC

19 PUBLISHING INC

AMERICAN IDOL PRODUCTIONS INC

19 TOURING LLC

CORE MEDIA GROUP INC

INTERSCOPE RECORDS

IMPRESSIONS BY JAMI DOE 2

FUTUR SONICS INC. DOE41

FUTURE SONICS INC.

FOX INTERACTIVE MEDIA INC.

FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY

UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC.

19 ENTERTAINMENT INC.

IMPRESSIONS BY JAMI (DOE 2)

TWENTY-FIRST CENTURY FOX PRODUCTIONS INC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

19 TOURING LLC

JAMI IMPRESSIONS BY

UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC.

19 ENTERTAINMENT INC.

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

OWEN GREGORY J. ESQ.

OWEN PATTERSON & OWEN

OWEN GREGORY JAMES

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LINDEMANN BLAKE J.

BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

FRESCH ELAINE K. ESQ.

JEFFREY SHARON S.

BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN LLP

DIEDEREICH & ASSOCIATES

HENKE ROBERT ELDON

PETTIBONE DOUGLAS JAMES

LINDEMANN BLAKE JOSEPH

FRESCH ELAINE KATHERINE

FRESCH ELAINE KATHERINE ESQ.

BERMAN EVAN ANDREW

PETTIBONE LAW

JEFFREY SHARON SACHIKO

HURVITZ MICHAEL JOSEPH

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

HENKE ROBERT ELDON

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/22/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/22/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORJS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

4/2/2018: DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORJS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATIORIES INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COINTINUE TRIAL;DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J.HURVTIZ;PROPOSED ORDER

4/24/2018: DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATIORIES INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COINTINUE TRIAL;DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J.HURVTIZ;PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE OF REJECTION PLEADINGS

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION PLEADINGS

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORIES INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/24/2018: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORIES INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORIES. INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC DATES AND RELATED DATES

4/26/2018: NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORIES. INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC DATES AND RELATED DATES

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE ORDER SUBMITEED WITH DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORIES, INC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] CORRECTED ORDER

5/1/2018: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE ORDER SUBMITEED WITH DEFENDANT WESTONE LABORATORIES, INC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] CORRECTED ORDER

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition of Plaintiff) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Future Sonics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Future Sonics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Declaration (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Future Sonics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Future Sonics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Other - (Appendix of Exhibits); Filed by Future Sonics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Declaration (in Support of Motion); Filed by Future Sonics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
317 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (fremantlemedeia nothr america inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (twenty-first century fox productio ns inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC643000    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: A

Calendar 8   Motion pro hac vice

GRANT

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORE MEDIA GROUP INC is a litigant