This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 23:00:11 (UTC).

MICHAEL PAGAN VS VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS

Case Summary

On 06/17/2015 MICHAEL PAGAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4854

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAGAN MICHAEL

WANG HAO

ZHAO YONG

Defendant

VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS HOME OWNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON|OMOTOSHO LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHTER TURNER SENET &

KULIK GOTTESMAN & SIEGEL LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO OPERATIVECOMPLAINT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCEC/F 1/6/16) - Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS HOME OWNERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Docketat 1:32 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Docketat 01:32 pm in Department C, Margaret M. Bernal, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer (AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OFPLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT;(CONT. FROM FEB. 11, 2016)) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MICHAEL PAGAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Continued by Defendant) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department C, Lori Ann Fournier, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer (AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OFPLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT;) - Continued by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS HOME OWNERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS LLC is a litigant