This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 19:29:03 (UTC).

MICHAEL MOORE VS SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 05/19/2015 MICHAEL MOORE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, EMILIE H. ELIAS and H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2200

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

EMILIE H. ELIAS

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

ACE GROUP

DOES 1-50

GROE MICHAEL

GROVER JEFF

HUBBARD CYNTHIA

LYTON MICHAEL

PASCAL AMY

SONY PICTURES ENT

VENGER LEONARD ESQ.

WEIL LEAH ESQ.

WEIL LEAH

FATTORINI FERDINAND

ROSALES JUNE

ZONA MICHAEL DR.

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (AAIC)

SONY CORPORATION

HARDIMAN CAROLYN

CAINES DWIGHT

SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COUSINEAU MARIA LOUISE

ROSEN SABA LLP

ROSEN JAMES R. ESQ.

MARIA LOUISE COUSINUEAU

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING

6/2/2015: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MOORE'S COMPLAINT; ETC

7/2/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MOORE'S COMPLAINT; ETC

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

5/19/2015: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

COMPLAINT 1. COMMITTED INSURANCE FRAUD/DECEIT; ETC

5/19/2015: COMPLAINT 1. COMMITTED INSURANCE FRAUD/DECEIT; ETC

DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MOORE'S COMPLAINT

7/2/2015: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MOORE'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/24/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/19/2015: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

6/12/2015: SUMMONS

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/13/2015: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

7/22/2015: MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MOORE'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

7/2/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MOORE'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • at 08:32 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Judgment (OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND (SIGNED BY JUDGE H. JAY FORD III) ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Amy Pascal (Defendant); Michael Lyton (Defendant); Michael Groe (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Sony Pictures Entertainment Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs (MEMO OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED COSTS $5552.75 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Michael Moore (Plaintiff); Michael Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Sony Pictures Entertainment Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Demurrer sustained without leave) -

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2015
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 44; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Michael Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT 1. COMMITTED INSURANCE FRAUD/DECEIT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Michael Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.