This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 12:04:04 (UTC).

MICHAEL JAY BERGER VS 5425 S.M.B. LTD., ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 02/13/2015 MICHAEL JAY BERGER filed an Other lawsuit against 5425 S M B LTD , . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3771

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERGER MICHAEL JAY

Defendants

5425 S.M.B. LTD

CANNY JR. ROBERT E.

HARIRI BAHMAN

KADIN DAVID SCOTT

KAPLAN JEROME ALAN

KAPLAN KENEGOS & KADIN

KENEGOS JOAN E.

MOGHADAM GEORGE

NOVEEN ALEXANDER

MOGHADAM BAHMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BERGER MICHAEL JAY

LEVY MARVIN

KAPLAN KENEGOS & KADIN

KAPLAN JEROME

FASEN LEO

PRATT SR. CHAD T-W

WILLIAM D. BOWEN ESQUIRE

LEO FASEN ESQUIRE

 

Court Documents

Offer to Compromise

7/23/2018: Offer to Compromise

Substitution of Attorney

7/17/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

6/17/2019: Minute Order

Witness List

7/17/2018: Witness List

Brief

8/20/2018: Brief

Brief

8/20/2018: Brief

Minute Order

5/16/2019: Minute Order

Exhibit List

7/17/2018: Exhibit List

Request for Statement of Decision

11/9/2018: Request for Statement of Decision

Substitution of Attorney

7/17/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Trial Brief

7/17/2018: Trial Brief

Certificate of Mailing for

5/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 2:41 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • at 4:13 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Request for Statement of Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department N; Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court's Ruling & Order Entered) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Court's Ruling & Order Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department N; Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
277 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.