This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2018 at 11:56:08 (UTC).

MICHAEL ESQUER VS GOLDEN STATE FOODS CORP

Case Summary

On 06/03/2016 MICHAEL ESQUER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE FOODS CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and CARL J. WEST. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2679

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

CARL J. WEST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESQUER MICHAEL

Defendant

GOLDEN STATE FOODS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIVAK LAW FIRM THE

Defendant Attorney

PC JACKSON LEWIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

7/21/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Minute Order

7/3/2017: Minute Order

Status Report

6/29/2017: Status Report

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/22/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

2/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Order

1/25/2017: Order

Status Report

12/7/2016: Status Report

Order

10/12/2016: Order

Minute Order

10/11/2016: Minute Order

Stipulation

10/7/2016: Stipulation

Civil Deposit

9/22/2016: Civil Deposit

SUMMONS

6/3/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EMPLOYEES FOR ALL 1IOU WORKED AT CORRECT RATES OF PAY (LAB.CODE ? 221, 1194, 1197, ND 1198); ETC

6/3/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EMPLOYEES FOR ALL 1IOU WORKED AT CORRECT RATES OF PAY (LAB.CODE ? 221, 1194, 1197, ND 1198); ETC

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

8/2/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Minute Order

7/3/2018: Minute Order

Other -

6/28/2018: Other -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff); Golden State Foods Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketJOINT STATUS REPORT RE: ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 309; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketMinute Order MINUTES ENTERED 08/09/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketOrder INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Esquer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EMPLOYEES FOR ALL 1IOU WORKED AT CORRECT RATES OF PAY (LAB.CODE 221, 1194, 1197, ND 1198); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2679    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 12

Dept. 12 SSC

BC 622679

Esquer v. Golden State Foods Corp.

March 17, 2020

Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement

Court’s Observations and Requirements:

(1) The following language of the release, “and includes in its effect all claims based on, arising out of, or related to the PAGA claim,” appears to include wage claims within its scope, which is improper.

(2) Is the time period for which claims are released consistent with the identification of the persons who are receiving payment?

(3) The amount to be paid to the named Plaintiff for his individual claims is not disclosed. The court requires this information to determine whether the PAGA settlement terms are reasonable and to make an effective public record of the terms of the settlement which this court is asked to approve.

(4) The payment checks to PAGA members should be accompanied by a letter advising them of the settlement terms.

(5) The DIR unpaid wages fund is no longer accepting funds from third parties. Another distribution of unclaimed funds must be specified.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE FOODS is a litigant