This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 12:06:24 (UTC).

MICHAEL BUCHNO FACTOR VS GARY FACTOR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 MICHAEL BUCHNO FACTOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GARY FACTOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5549

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCHNOFACTOR MICHAEL G62980 B23021ZVP

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 10

FACTOR GARY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

3/13/2015: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

Unknown

3/16/2015: Unknown

Unknown

4/21/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/22/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/22/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

5/27/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT/ACTION /SETTLEMENT OBTAINED BY MICHAEL BUCHNOFACTOR LIEN CLAIMANT: COURTCALL, LLC

6/16/2015: NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT/ACTION /SETTLEMENT OBTAINED BY MICHAEL BUCHNOFACTOR LIEN CLAIMANT: COURTCALL, LLC

Unknown

6/17/2015: Unknown

Minute Order

7/1/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/31/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/30/2015: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT/ACTION /SETTLEMENT OBTAINED BY MICHAEL BUCHNOFACTOR LIEN CLAIMANT: COURTCALL, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Notice of Lien; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Buchnofactor, Michael, G62980, B23021Zvp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Buchnofactor, Michael, G62980, B23021Zvp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Buchnofactor, Michael, G62980, B23021Zvp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC575549    Hearing Date: March 19, 2020    Dept: 29

Calleja v. Chavez bc575549

Hearing on the Motion to Extend Discovery Cut off Date is continued to 5/6/2020 at 1:30 pm.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, the court finds good cause to continue the hearing.

The Court is ordered to give notice.