Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 02:40:33 (UTC).

MICHAEL B SCHWAB VS LEONARD STEINER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2015 MICHAEL B SCHWAB filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against LEONARD STEINER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU, RITA MILLER, MICHAEL JOHNSON, STEPHEN M. MOLONEY and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3709

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

RITA MILLER

MICHAEL JOHNSON

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PACIFIC BROKERAGE INC

TREASURE ISLAND EVENT VENUE

SCHWAB MICHAEL B

Defendants and Respondents

ESTEVEZ J RAMON

GODDARD ADRIAN

JEFFE EVENTS

UPPER V MANAGEMENT GROUP INC

BEHUNIN NICHOLAS

STEINER & LIBO PC

STEINER LEONARD

Not Classified By Court

ONE LEGAL LLC

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

LAMB CYNTHIA

USA LEGAL NETWORK

HONG-ELSEY JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MURRAY & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID H SCHWARTZ INC

SCHWARTZ DAVID H.

STEPANIAN MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ELKIN GAMBOA & ASHKINADZE LLP

LAW OFFICE OF JAMES A OTTO

REGINA ASHKINADZE

GORDON & REES LLP

VANDER WERF CHRISTINA MORGAN

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.I6

2/22/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.I6

NOTICE OF APPEAL CROSS APPEAL UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE APPELLATE

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL CROSS APPEAL UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE APPELLATE

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

6/7/2018: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

Proof of Service

7/10/2018: Proof of Service

Substitution of Attorney

10/4/2018: Substitution of Attorney

DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNIN'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT FILED BY DEFENDANTS LEONARD STEINER AND STEINER & LIBO, P.C.

2/26/2015: DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNIN'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT FILED BY DEFENDANTS LEONARD STEINER AND STEINER & LIBO, P.C.

SUMMONS

2/26/2015: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/27/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

4/8/2015: Minute Order

CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/9/2015: CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order

5/29/2015: Minute Order

Proof of Service

6/29/2015: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16(G)

7/24/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16(G)

DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNIN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING ANY DISCOVERY PENDING THE DETERMINATION ON THE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY; MEM

8/24/2015: DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNIN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING ANY DISCOVERY PENDING THE DETERMINATION ON THE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY; MEM

DECLARATION OF LEONARD STEINER IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS: (A) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB'S MOTION TO COMPEL (B) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CHARLES R. SCHWAB'S MOTION TO COMPEL; ET

11/3/2015: DECLARATION OF LEONARD STEINER IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS: (A) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB'S MOTION TO COMPEL (B) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CHARLES R. SCHWAB'S MOTION TO COMPEL; ET

PLAINTIFF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STEINER & LIBO, PC'S EXPARTE OBJECTIONS TO REFEREE'S MARCH 28, 2016 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO QUASH AND FOR PR

4/8/2016: PLAINTIFF MICHAEL B. SCHWAB'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STEINER & LIBO, PC'S EXPARTE OBJECTIONS TO REFEREE'S MARCH 28, 2016 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO QUASH AND FOR PR

REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION SUBMITTED BY MICHAEL B. SCHWAB IN CONNECTION WITH THE PENDING EX PARTE OBJECTION TO REFEREE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION DATED MARCH 28, 2016

4/11/2016: REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION SUBMITTED BY MICHAEL B. SCHWAB IN CONNECTION WITH THE PENDING EX PARTE OBJECTION TO REFEREE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION DATED MARCH 28, 2016

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/1/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

328 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference (Regarding Appeal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Nicholas Behunin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • at 08:34 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference Regarding Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Stephen G. Larson (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
520 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2015
  • EXHIBIT A PART 8 TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • EXHIBIT G TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNINS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DECLARATION OF REGINA ASHKINADZE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNINS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DECLARATION THAT TIME TO FILE ANTI-SLAPP IS TOLLED WHILE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS PENDING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION MORE THAN 60 DAYS AFTER SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • EXHIBIT A PART 7 TO IEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • EXH1BIT A PART 11 TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • EXHIBITS 40 THROUGH 44 TO DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS BEHUNIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NICHOLAS BEHUNINS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION PART 3 OF 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC573709    Hearing Date: April 29, 2021    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: April 29, 2021

Case Name: Schwab v. Steiner, et al.

Case No.: BC573709

Motion: Motion to Compel Further Responses

Moving Party: Plaintiff Michael B. Schwab

Responding Party: Unopposed

Tentative Ruling: The Motion is granted.

Plaintiff Michael B. Schwab seeks to compel further responses from Defendant Nicholas Behunin as to his requests for production of documents, set one, nos. 1-53.

Behunin apparently served an opposition on Michael but did not file the opposition with the Court.

In any case, the Court is inclined to refer all discovery disputes in this matter to a discovery referee. (Code Civ. Proc. § 639.) Such shall be discussed at the Motion hearing.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIVE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where STEINER & LIBO PC is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE LEGAL is a litigant