This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 00:11:56 (UTC).

MICHAEL A ROBINS JR VS VERSA LOGISTICS LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 MICHAEL A ROBINS JR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VERSA LOGISTICS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4321

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ROBINS MICHAEL A. JR.

CRUTCHFIELD EUGENE

Defendants and Respondents

VERSA LOGISTICS LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ACKERMANN CRAIG J.

MELMED JONATHAN

GOMEZ ALVIN M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ANDERSON MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

SCHNEIDER ERIC A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

3/2/2018: Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

Declaration

3/2/2018: Declaration

Declaration

3/2/2018: Declaration

Declaration

3/2/2018: Declaration

Judgment

3/26/2018: Judgment

Order

3/26/2018: Order

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

CLASS ACTION AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: (1) PAGA PENALTIES FOR DEFENDANT'S WILLFUL MISCLASSIFICATION OF DRIVERS IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTION 226.8 AND 2698, ET SEQ.; ET

12/16/2016: CLASS ACTION AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: (1) PAGA PENALTIES FOR DEFENDANT'S WILLFUL MISCLASSIFICATION OF DRIVERS IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTION 226.8 AND 2698, ET SEQ.; ET

Minute Order

1/10/2017: Minute Order

Order

1/21/2017: Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/27/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Appearance

2/1/2017: Notice of Appearance

Summons

4/7/2017: Summons

Notice of Motion

11/1/2017: Notice of Motion

Declaration

11/1/2017: Declaration

Declaration

11/1/2017: Declaration

Declaration

11/1/2017: Declaration

Order

12/1/2017: Order

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • at 4:30 PM in Department 12; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Michael A. Jr. Robins (Plaintiff); Eugene Crutchfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF EMILIO COFINCO ON BEHALF OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR WITH RESPECT TO NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Michael A. Jr. Robins (Plaintiff); Eugene Crutchfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Michael A. Jr. Robins (Plaintiff); Eugene Crutchfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • at 4:30 PM in Department 12; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; (Order ReRelated Cases; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2017
  • Order Order and Notice of Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 308; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Status Report INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Michael A. Jr. Robins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Michael A. Jr. Robins (Plaintiff); Eugene Crutchfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CLASS ACTION AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: (1) PAGA PENALTIES FOR DEFENDANT'S WILLFUL MISCLASSIFICATION OF DRIVERS IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTION 226.8 AND 2698, ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less