This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 19:29:05 (UTC).

METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION ET AL VS LAS TERRAZAS HOM

Case Summary

On 02/14/2013 METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against LAS TERRAZAS HOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1117

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONS-

Defendants and Respondents

ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN HAVING OR

BANK OF AMERICA NA

BOLDT JORDAN P.

BOLDT ROBERT R.

BOTTOMLINE MORTGAGE INC.

CAC EXCHANGE I LLC

CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY

CENTRAL MORTGAGE LOAN SERVICING COMPANY

CHAN-YU JANE S.

COCUMELLI CHRISTINA

COLBY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

DESAI JOSEPH E.

DESAI PRIMILA J.

DO MICHAEL TRUNG

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

DUFRESNE JOHN B.

DUFRESNE SHERRIE L.

ENVISION COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CO. LLC

GMAC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON A PROF. CORP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

MALCOLM WILLIAM G. ESQ.

MASON K. CATHERINE ESQ.

WINTERS FRED TIMOTHY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF LISA M. BENSON, MAI, IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DEPOSIT THE PROBABLE COMPENSATION

3/8/2013: DECLARATION OF LISA M. BENSON, MAI, IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DEPOSIT THE PROBABLE COMPENSATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

3/27/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

3/27/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

3/27/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

3/27/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS; COMPLAINT IN

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

5/3/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

5/3/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

5/13/2013: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

6/17/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT

6/17/2013: INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT

6/18/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

6/21/2013: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CENTRAL MORTGAGE LOAN SERVICING COMPANY; ORDER

7/9/2013: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CENTRAL MORTGAGE LOAN SERVICING COMPANY; ORDER

Minute Order -

8/13/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/7/2014: Minute Order -

JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

3/21/2014: JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 42; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 42; Default Prove Up Hearing (Civil Default Prove Up Hearing; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION OF REGINA N. DAI4NER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 42; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF LISA M. BENSON, MAI, IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DEPOSIT THE PROBABLE COMPENSATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DEPOSIT THE PROBABLE COMPENSATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Metro Gold Line Foothill Extension Cons- (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Metro Gold Line Foothill Extension Cons- (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Metro Gold Line Foothill Extension Cons- (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIGHT START MORTGAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAC EXCHANGE I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL MORTGAGE LOAN SERVICING is a litigant