This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2016 at 00:01:32 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

Case Summary

On 04/22/2011 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is C. EDWARD SIMPSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7251

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC.

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE & NIVINSKUS

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS NYE SINUNU WALKER LLP

J.KIM APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2012
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (With prejudice Entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • Notice (of OSC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Notice of Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Declaration (CCP 585 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (Without prejudice Complaint as to Does 1-20 only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Declaration (CCP 1033 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALHAMBRA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant