This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 01:55:48 (UTC).

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY VS FELIX CHU ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2016 MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FELIX CHU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ and DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5289

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY A CALIF. CORP.

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHU ANNIE

CHU. FELIX

CHU FELIX

Cross Defendants

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL INC.

HOSE-MAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKSON AND RICHART

JEROME M. JACKSON ESQ.

JACKSON JEROME MARK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN J. KALTENBACH ESQ.

GRAHAM & ASSOCIATES

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

Cross Defendant Attorney

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/1/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

2/1/2019: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

2/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Motion (FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS;2) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;) - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-05-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Stipulation (TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Stipulation; Filed by FELIX CHU (Defendant); ANNIE CHU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Mercury Casualty Company, a Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Felix Chu. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Felix Chu. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mercury Casualty Company, a Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mercury Casualty Company, a Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant