This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:14:20 (UTC).

MERCEDES JOYCE JENKINS VS CHARTS EDWARD THOMAS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 MERCEDES JOYCE JENKINS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHARTS EDWARD THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, MAREN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1720

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NELSON, MAREN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENKINS MERCEDES JOYCE

Respondent

THOMAS CHARTS EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2016
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Nelson, Maren, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Request - Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jenkins, Mercedes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jenkins, Mercedes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (PREMATURE/DEFECTIVE - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jenkins, Mercedes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jenkins, Mercedes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jenkins, Mercedes - Granted on 2015-12-16 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less