This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2016 at 16:01:15 (UTC).

MENDEZ VS FIRST AMERICAN TERM REALTY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2008 MENDEZ filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN TERM REALTY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH VANDER LANS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1094

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUDITH VANDER LANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE S. MENDEZ

Defendants

HILDA GARCIA

FIRST AMERICAN TEAM REALTY INC

FIRST AMERICAN TEAM REALTY INC.

FIRST AMERICA TEAM REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CARLSON LAW GROUP INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2009
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT; ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJ ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2008
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketResponse (IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • DocketOpposition (TO MTN TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2008
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • DocketNotice of Motion (AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (AGAINST: FIRST AMERICA TEAM REALTY, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketDefault Entered (AGAINST: HILDA GARCIA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketDefault Entered (AGAINST: FIRST AMERICAN TEAM REALTY, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (AGAINST: HILDA GARCIA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: HILDA GARCIA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: FIRST AMERICA TEAM REALTY, INC. DBA FIRST AMERICA TEAM REALTY AND AS FIRST AMERICAN TEAM REALTY, INC. BY SERVING THE AGENT FOR PROCESS, STEVE SOTHEAR VONG***JOI (LAST NAME UNKNOWN)) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2008
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2008
  • DocketComplaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less