This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 19:15:24 (UTC).

MELLISSA RENNE LARA ET AL VS ARMANDO HERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2014 MELLISSA RENNE LARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARMANDO HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8365

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARA MELLISSA RENNE

LARA MELISSA RENNE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMAYA SANTOS R. QUINTEROS

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HERNANDEZ ARMANDO

NORTHERN REFRIGERATED TRANSPORTATION INC

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. L.P.

ELLIOTT AUTO SUPPLY CO. INC. [ROE 1]

FACTORY MOTOR PARTS

NO. REFRIGERATED TRANSPORTATION INC.

ELLIOT AUTO SYPPLY CO DOE 1

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP

Defendant and Respondent

FACTORY MOTOR PARTS

Minor

VEGA ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

BANISH BRIAN J. ESQ.

PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP

VITITOE LAW GROUP

PANISH BRIAN J. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEN

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS PC

MORROW & WHITE

SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

SPRIGGS SCOTT B. ESQ.

WHITE CHRISTOPHER A. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS PC

MORROW & WHITE

SPRIGGS SCOTT B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE & NEGLIGENCE PER SE; ETC

3/5/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE & NEGLIGENCE PER SE; ETC

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EXPARTE

3/5/2014: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EXPARTE

SUMMONS -

3/10/2014: SUMMONS -

SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

4/2/2014: SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE

4/2/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/2/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/2/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/2/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/11/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

4/17/2014: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/1/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/5/2014: PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF ERRATUM TO CORRECT THE REFERENCE IN THE COMPLAINT TO MINOR PLAINTIFF?S YEAR OF BIRTH

5/22/2014: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF ERRATUM TO CORRECT THE REFERENCE IN THE COMPLAINT TO MINOR PLAINTIFF?S YEAR OF BIRTH

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

6/9/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE

6/9/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/9/2014: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/2/2014: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department O; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketOrd of Disml with prejudice; Filed by MELISSA RENNE LARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by MELISSA RENNE LARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department O; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketOrd Approv Comp of Minor's Claim; Filed by MELISSA RENNE LARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
288 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR ANTHONY VEGA ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MELISSA RENNE LARA (Plaintiff); Mellissa Renne Lara (Plaintiff); Anthony Vega (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MELISSA RENNE LARA (Plaintiff); Mellissa Renne Lara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR ANTHONY VEGA GUARDIAN AD LITEM(FAXED) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EXPARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE & NEGLIGENCE PER SE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/1961
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Factory Motor Parts International LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLIOTT AUTO SUPPLY CO.INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRIGGS SCOTT B.