This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2021 at 09:43:16 (UTC).

MELBOURNE ROGER LOCKIE VS COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE, INC. ETAL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2013 MELBOURNE ROGER LOCKIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE, INC ETAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9498

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOCKIE BARBARA

LOCKIE MELBOURNE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

AMERICAN AIR POWER HERITAGE FLYING MUSEUM

AMERICAN AIR POWER HERITAGE FLYING MUSUEM

AMERICAN AIR POWER HERITAGE FOUNDATION

ATLANTIC AVIATION INC.

BURBANK BOB HOPE AIRPORT

BURBANK CITY OF

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHO-

CALIFORNIA STATE OF

COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

TBI AIRPORT MANAGEMENT INC.

TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

MERCURY AIR CENTER-BURBANK INC.

CITY OF BURBANK

BURBANK BOB HOPE AIRPORT AUTHORITY

MERCURY AIR CENTER - BURBANK INC.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant

COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE INC.

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JUSTICE MICHAEL L. ESQ.

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL L. JUSTICE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BUCHANAN CHARLES DUFFY ESQ.

KERN WOLLEY P.C.

MICHAELIS MONTANARI & JOHNSON P.C.

MONTANARI GARRY L. ESQ.

ROSE WALKER LLP

RUIZ RODOLFO F. ESQ.

SCHMECKPEPER KATHY A.

TERHAR MICHAEL J. ESQ.

VANDERFORD & RUIZ LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSE WALKER LLP

SCHMECKPEPER KATHY A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

12/4/2013: Notice of Related Case

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES C.C.P.425.1 1

12/4/2013: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES C.C.P.425.1 1

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES C.C.P.425.1 1

12/4/2013: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES C.C.P.425.1 1

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/4/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

12/4/2013: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS -

12/9/2013: SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

12/11/2013: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/13/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/16/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT TBI AIRPORT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/30/2014: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT TBI AIRPORT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/30/2014: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE, INC. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

2/5/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE, INC. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

NOTICE OF CHANGED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

2/5/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT ATLANTIC AVIATION, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/21/2014: DEFENDANT ATLANTIC AVIATION, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

2/21/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

SUONS CROSS-CORN PLAINT

2/21/2014: SUONS CROSS-CORN PLAINT

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MELBOURNE ROGER LOCKIE (Plaintiff); BARBARA LOCKIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department E; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-01-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE, INC. (Legacy Party); BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
271 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES C.C.P.425.1 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES C.C.P.425.1 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Melbourne Lockie (Plaintiff); MELBOURNE ROGER LOCKIE (Plaintiff); BARBARA LOCKIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Related Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY AIR CENTER-BURBANK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMEMORATIVE AIR FORCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TBI Airport Management, Inc. is a litigant