This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2020 at 15:36:03 (UTC).

MEHROUJAN SHIRVANIAN VS ASA BROS INC.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2014 MEHROUJAN SHIRVANIAN filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against ASA BROS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN and VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2065

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SHIRVANIAN HASMIK

SHIRVANIAN MEHROUJAN

SHIRVANIAN SARKIS

SHIRVANIAN SEDA

Defendants

ASA BROS INC.

CARE CASTLE

DOES 1 TO 250

YAZICHYAN ANDREY AS DOE 2

YAZICHYAN SERGEY AS DOE 1

YAZICHIAN SERGEY

Respondent

ASA BROS INC. DBA CARE CASTLE

Assignees and Not Classified By Court

UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC

UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Assignee Attorney

YEARGIN COLE WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

6/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

7/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

2/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT ORDER

5/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT ORDER

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

3/13/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND T...)

4/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND T...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/28/2014: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

12/30/2014: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

4/7/2015: Minute Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS W. STADMILLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY OF THE CASE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA CIVIL RULES OF COURT RULE 3.1800

6/3/2015: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS W. STADMILLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY OF THE CASE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA CIVIL RULES OF COURT RULE 3.1800

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH) AMENDED

7/16/2015: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH) AMENDED

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/22/2015: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

9/9/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/25/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/17/2015: Minute Order

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/19/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • Hearing08/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Hearing08/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Motion - Other for order to issue consumer report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing and Order); Filed by Upstream Capital Investments LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (for order to issue consumer report) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing and Order); Filed by Upstream Capital Investments LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Exam; Notice of Issued and Held Bench Warrant); Filed by Upstream Capital Investments LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (for order to issue consumer report) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sarkis Shirvanian as Successor in Interest to Mehroujan Shirvanian Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32); Filed by Mehroujan Shirvanian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketElder Abuse/Dependent Adult Abuse Case; Filed by Mehroujan Shirvanian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mehroujan Shirvanian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC102065    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: W

SHIRVANIAN V. ASA BROS, INC.

MOTION FOR ORDER TO ISSUE CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT

Date of Hearing: August 6, 2020 Trial Date: None set.

Department: W Case No.: LC102065

Moving Party: Assignee Upstream Capital Investments LLC

Responding Party: None

BACKGROUND

On August 28, 2014, Plaintiffs Mehroujan Shirvanian, by and through his successor in interest, Sarkis Shirvanian, Sarkis Shirvanian, Anne Shirvanian, Sarkis Shirvanian, Hasmik Shirvanian, and Seda Shirvanian brought a complaint against Defendant Asa Bros, Inc. dba Care Castle for elder abuse, negligence, negligent hiring and supervision, fraud, and wrongful death.

On November 17, 2014, Plaintiffs filed a Doe Amendment naming Sergey Yazichian as Doe Defendant 1.

On December 17, 2015, default judgment was entered against Sergey Yazichian and Asa Bros, Inc. dba Care Castle in the amount of $1,325,377.95. The judgment was then assigned by Plaintiff to Upstream Capital Care Investments, LLC.

[TENTATIVE] RULING:

Assignee Upstream Capital Investments LLC’s Motion for Order to Issue Consumer Credit Report is GRANTED.

DISCUSSION

Assignee Upstream Capital Care Investments, LLC seeks an order directing one or more credit reporting agencies to provide a copy of Judgment Debtor’s credit report pursuant to Civil Code section 1785.11 and Code of Civil Procedure section 187 as Defendants have been unwilling to enter into a voluntary settlement. Moreover, Upstream contends it is believed that information contained in the consumer credit report will allow for successful enforcement of the court’s judgment and lead to satisfaction of the judgment which has been entered against Sergey Yazichian.

Code of Civil Procedure section 187 provides “[w]hen jurisdiction is, by the Constitution or this Code, or by any other statute, conferred on a Court or judicial officer, all the means necessary to carry it into effect are also given; and in the exercise of this jurisdiction, if the course of proceeding be not specifically pointed out by this Code or the statute, any suitable process or mode of proceeding may be adopted which may appear most conformable to the spirit of this Code.”

Civil Code section 1785.11 provides a consumer credit reporting agency shall furnish a consumer credit report in response to the order of a court having jurisdiction to issue an order. (CC §1785.11(a)(1).) The court finds that the moving party has adequately established good cause to order the credit report in this case, given the substantial judgment it has obtained and the failure of defendants to satisfy the judgment. (Yeargin Decl. ¶4.)

Based on the foregoing, Assignee Upstream Capital Investments LLC’s Motion for Order to Issue Consumer Credit Report is GRANTED.