This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 10:43:13 (UTC).

MEGHAN SLOEY VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2014 MEGHAN SLOEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE, ELIA WEINBACH and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9856

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

ELIA WEINBACH

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SLOEY MEGHAN

Defendants and Respondents

DHALIWAL GURPREET. M.D.

DOES 1-100

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

DHALWAL GURPREET M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BROWN BROWN & BROWN

BROWN DAVID S.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

EVEN RANDOLPH M. ESQ.

RANDOLPH M. EVEN & ASSOCIATES

SCHULER & BROWN

SCHULER & BROWN LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/25/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/25/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/22/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/22/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/30/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF RANDOLPH M. EVEN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1332

10/30/2014: DECLARATION OF RANDOLPH M. EVEN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1332

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/31/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT

STIPULATION

12/8/2014: STIPULATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/8/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOAN BENJAMIN BROWN

1/26/2015: NOTICE AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOAN BENJAMIN BROWN

Minute Order

4/16/2015: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/17/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/17/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/30/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS

5/6/2015: NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

5/6/2015: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF MEGHAN SLOEY TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE BEFORE THE COURT AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1987(B)

5/6/2015: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF MEGHAN SLOEY TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE BEFORE THE COURT AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1987(B)

PLAINTIFF?S DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING FEES

6/3/2015: PLAINTIFF?S DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING FEES

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • Opposition ( TO MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Notice ( OF TRIAL SETTING ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Order-Case Management Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Reply to Opposition ( TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PTF'S DEPOSITION AND FOR AN ORDER TO SET THE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice of Continuance ( OF HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL PTF'S FURTHER ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SETS TWO AND THREE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Opposition ( TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2014
  • Declaration ( OF RANDOLPH M. EVEN PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1332 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Declaration (OF RANDOLPH M EVEN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.1332 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Proof of Service ( PARTY SERVED: GURPREET DHALIWAL, M.D. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Proof of Service ( PARTY SERVED: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NEW MEXICO is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant