This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 19:35:26 (UTC).

MEGAN MEADOWCROFT ET AL VS SILVERTON PARTNERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2016 MEGAN MEADOWCROFT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SILVERTON PARTNERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3239

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MEADOWCROFT MEGAN

BROWN AMBER

Defendants and Respondents

KEYWAYS VINEYAR AND WINERY LLC

PINEIRO CARLOS

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

ESSENCE BUSINESS GROUP INC.

SILVERTON PARTNERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AARONS LAW FIRM A PROF. CORP. THE

AARONS MARTIN ISAAC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TO MAY T.

SHIODA GENE HITOSHI

KIM JAMES ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Jury Question

8/29/2018: Jury Question

STEPULATION AND ORDER UPON STIPULATION TO RELATE AND CONSOLIDATE

2/2/2018: STEPULATION AND ORDER UPON STIPULATION TO RELATE AND CONSOLIDATE

Minute Order -

4/26/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/19/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

8/22/2018: Minute Order -

JURY QUESTION AS TO WITNESS: KEVIN ZHANG

8/29/2018: JURY QUESTION AS TO WITNESS: KEVIN ZHANG

Minute Order -

9/7/2018: Minute Order -

JURY INSTRUCTIONS

9/11/2018: JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Opposition - Opposition to motion for judgment notwithstanding the verdict

10/25/2018: Opposition - Opposition to motion for judgment notwithstanding the verdict

Opposition - Opposition to motion for new trial

10/25/2018: Opposition - Opposition to motion for new trial

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

9/13/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

DEFENDANTS THE SILVERTON PARTNERS, INC. AND ESSENCE BUSINESS GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS MEGAN MEADOWCROFT AND AMBER BROWN'S COMPLAINT

11/17/2016: DEFENDANTS THE SILVERTON PARTNERS, INC. AND ESSENCE BUSINESS GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS MEGAN MEADOWCROFT AND AMBER BROWN'S COMPLAINT

NOT FOUND PROOF OF SERVICE

3/14/2017: NOT FOUND PROOF OF SERVICE

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, AND/OR ARGUMENT RE HEALTH OF DEFENDANT PINEIRO'S FAMILY MEMBERS; ETC.

10/19/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, AND/OR ARGUMENT RE HEALTH OF DEFENDANT PINEIRO'S FAMILY MEMBERS; ETC.

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE (01); DECLARATION OF SHANNON H.P. WARD

10/24/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE (01); DECLARATION OF SHANNON H.P. WARD

DEFENDANT ESSENCE BUSINESS GROUP, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO: (A) DISQUALIFY STEVE QI, THOMAS ZHOU, AND THE LAW OFFICES OF STEVE QI & ASSOCIATES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON ESS

10/26/2017: DEFENDANT ESSENCE BUSINESS GROUP, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO: (A) DISQUALIFY STEVE QI, THOMAS ZHOU, AND THE LAW OFFICES OF STEVE QI & ASSOCIATES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON ESS

Minute Order -

11/14/2017: Minute Order -

STIPULATION TO PRE-SCREEN JURORS DUE TO ECONOMIC HARDSHIP BASED ON JUROR'S JURY LEAVE BENEFIT AND OTHER HARDSHIPS

11/22/2017: STIPULATION TO PRE-SCREEN JURORS DUE TO ECONOMIC HARDSHIP BASED ON JUROR'S JURY LEAVE BENEFIT AND OTHER HARDSHIPS

194 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Amended Judgment on Jury Verdict); Filed by Megan Meadowcroft (Plaintiff); Amber Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff Megan Medowcroft and Amber Brown's Motio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Continuance re Motion for Attorney Fees); Filed by Megan Meadowcroft (Plaintiff); Amber Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Plaintiff Megan Meadowcroft and Amber Brown's Motion for Atto...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave (to amend*******************CRS*****************)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees); Filed by Megan Meadowcroft (Plaintiff); Amber Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Docketat 3:13 PM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/18/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
400 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Megan Meadowcroft (Plaintiff); Amber Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. HARASSMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESSENCE BUSINESS GROUP INC. is a litigant