This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:20:33 (UTC).

MEDWRITE INC VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/03/2016 MEDWRITE INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9138

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDWRITE INC.

Respondents and Defendants

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE PANARAMA CITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABRIEL SALOMONS LLP

Defendant Attorney

WONG CYNDI K.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/3/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

5/3/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF MEDWRITE, INC.

7/8/2016: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF MEDWRITE, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2016: NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

8/3/2016: Unknown

AMENDED PROOFS OF SERVICE

8/9/2016: AMENDED PROOFS OF SERVICE

Unknown

8/17/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

9/7/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

9/8/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Minute Order

10/6/2016: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/27/2016: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF SEULEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2/17/2017: NOTICE OF SEULEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

3/1/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/19/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER BY THE COURT

6/20/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER BY THE COURT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER BY THE COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panarama City (Defendant); Mission Community Hospital (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SEULEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Medwrite, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Medwrite, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panarama City (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF MEDWRITE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Medwrite, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less