This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 04:11:50 (UTC).

MEDISCAN STAFFING SERVICES, INC. VS. ORLANDO RAY GARCIA, ET

Case Summary

On 04/05/2010 MEDISCAN STAFFING SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORLANDO RAY GARCIA, ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON and PAUL GUTMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7619

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

PAUL GUTMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEDISCAN STAFFING SERVICES

MEDISCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

GARCIA ORLANDO RAY

PHARMPRO NETWORK INC.

Not Classified By Court

SIEGAL FLOYD J. ESQ.

Other

BASES JEFFREY M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHISHIAN ARA YERVANT

Defendant Attorney

DAYMUDE MICHAEL RAYMOND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2012
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion-Attorney Fees; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department NWB, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; Motion-Attorney Fees (& COSTS C/F 2-23-12) - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion-Attorney Fees; Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department B; (Non-Calendar Matter; Order-Nunc Pro Tunc) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Docketin Department NWB, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; Non-Calendar Matter - Order-Nunc Pro Tunc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department NWB, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; Motion-Attorney Fees (& COSTS) - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • DocketStipulation-Order; Filed by ORLANDO RAY GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • DocketStipulation-Order (CORRECTING JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED AND FILED ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketReply to Opposition (TO MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketReply to Opposition; Filed by ORLANDO RAY GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketApplication-Waive Court Fees&Costs Filed by Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by MEDISCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDISCAN STAFFING SERVICES INC.A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDSCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAYMUDE MICHAEL