This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:42:54 (UTC).

MEDINA, WALTER VS MEDINA, TERESA

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 MEDINA, WALTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEDINA, TERESA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3089

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDINA WALTER

Respondent

MEDINA TERESA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2016
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Order - Withhold Income for Child Support FL195 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter - Signed on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (2014/2015 taxes - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter - Service Date on 2016-10-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-20-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (Waived - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 10-13-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Statement - Financial (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Walter ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less