This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2020 at 06:00:48 (UTC).

MEDIA TALENT GROUP, INC. VS NICOLA SIX PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

Case Summary

On 05/22/2015 MEDIA TALENT GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NICOLA SIX PRODUCTIONS LIMITED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN, H. JAY FORD III and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4219

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

H. JAY FORD III

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDIA TALENT GROUP INC.

Defendants

NICOLA SIX PORDUCTIONS LIMITED

HANLEY ROBERTA

HANLEY CHRISTOPHER

GERTNER JORDAN

MUSE PRODUCTIONS INC

NICOLA SIX PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

Cross Defendant

KOSINSKI GEYER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RABEN ZEV F.

LAVELY & SINGER

EAGAN TODD STANFORD

Defendant Attorneys

LEOPOLD PETRICH AND SMITH

GOLDBERG STEPHEN J.

STEINER LEONARD

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ADAM D MILLER

 

Court Documents

Summons

7/16/2015: Summons

Substitution of Attorney

4/6/2016: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/13/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint

8/25/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-01-12 00:00:00

1/12/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-01-12 00:00:00

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/27/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

10/29/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/18/2017: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney

12/15/2016: Substitution of Attorney

Complaint

5/22/2015: Complaint

Ex Parte Application - For Order to Show Cause

8/7/2018: Ex Parte Application - For Order to Show Cause

Case Management Statement

8/25/2015: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-08-26 00:00:00

8/26/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-08-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply

4/20/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/25/2015: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2015: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Lodging

4/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Lodging

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Hearing09/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT MEDIA TALENT GROUP, INC. AND CROSS-DEFENDANT GEYER KOSINSKI?S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Geyer Kosinski (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Media Talent Group, Inc. and Cross-Defendant Geyer Kosiki's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial); Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Geyer Kosinski (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order to Continue Trial); Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Geyer Kosinski (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (for Order to Continue Trial); Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Geyer Kosinski (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed ((CROSS-COMPLAINT) ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Media Talent Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.