This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 04:14:14 (UTC).

MC CREW LTD VS CNR INTERNATIONAL INC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2015 MC CREW LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CNR INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8122

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MC CREW LTD

Defendants and Respondents

CNR INTERNATIONAL INC

DOES 1-15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RYU LAW FIRM

FIRM RYU LAW

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/21/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/2/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/2/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/3/2015: DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC AND OSC HEARING

12/3/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC AND OSC HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/19/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

JOINT STIPULATION

2/23/2016: JOINT STIPULATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/23/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC.

2/26/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC.

DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/1/2016: DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/29/2016: DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/12/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/8/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

8/11/2016: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

9/21/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/27/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE; ETC

9/27/2016: NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/28/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC AND OSC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DEFENDANT CNR INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by MC Crew, Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CNR INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MC Crew, Ltd. is a litigant