This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:48:44 (UTC).

MAYRA MACIAS VS ANA RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/12/2016 MAYRA MACIAS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANA RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5544

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MACIAS MAYRA

RODRIGUEZ ANA

OSWALDO RODRIGUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL

GUEVARA MERLYN

OSWALDO RODRIGUEZ AN

FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL

RIGHT ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GUEVARA MERLYN AN INDIVIDUAL

RODRIGUEZ ANA AN INDIVIDUAL

RODRIGUEZ OSVALDO AN INDIVIDUAL

RODRIGUEZ ANA

EDWARD FRISH

FRANCISCO GRANADENO

OSWALDO RODRIGUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL

RODRIGUEZ OSVALDO

CARLOS ARGUETA

RODRIGUEZ FRANCISCO

GUEVARA MERLYN

GRANADENO FRANCISCO

OSWALDO RODRIGUEZ AN

FRISH EDWARD

TEHION KIM

CENTURY 21 POWERHOUSE REALTY A

FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANCHEZ DENNIS JOHN LAW OFFICES OF

SANCHEZ DENNIS JOHN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FRISH LAW GROUP APLC

FRISH VADIM FELIX

TREDWAY LUMSDAINE & DOYLE LLP

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

ERLICH RINAT B

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

CUNNINGHAM TREADWELL & BARTELSTONE

EISEN DAVID STUART

MACHAT & ASSOCIATES PC

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS JOSEPH III

MACHAT MICHAEL

Cross Defendant Attorney

GAUGH KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SERVICE RESPONSE AND OR DEFAULT OF CROSS COMPLAINT

9/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SERVICE RESPONSE AND OR DEFAULT OF CROSS COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

8/1/2016: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

12/19/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

1/11/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-02-16 00:00:00

2/16/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-02-16 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to First Amended Complaint

2/21/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to First Amended Complaint

3/23/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-06-27 00:00:00

6/27/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-06-27 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00

7/19/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2017: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY DEFT. DAVID KIM; {PROPOSED} ORDER

4/27/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY DEFT. DAVID KIM; {PROPOSED} ORDER

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

7/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S

9/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) -

10/11/2018: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) -

Order - Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants. Century 21 Powerhouse Realty, Carlos Argueta and Francisco Granadeno's Application for Good Faith Settlement

2/8/2019: Order - Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants. Century 21 Powerhouse Realty, Carlos Argueta and Francisco Granadeno's Application for Good Faith Settlement

Answer

2/14/2019: Answer

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • Hearing03/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Hearing02/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Hearing01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading/default as to defendants Francisco Rodriguez and Merlyn Guevara to the third amended complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Hearing01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by MERLYN GUEVARA (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by MERLYN GUEVARA (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCourt Order/Ruling (Hearing 10-29-20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Merlyn Guevara (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
276 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MAYRA MACIAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MAYRA MACIAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketOther - (Notice of Settlement and Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement [Proposed] Order); Filed by MAYRA MACIAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC065544    Hearing Date: October 29, 2020    Dept: C

MACIAS v. RODRIGUEZ

CASE NO.: VC065544

HEARING: 10/29/2020

#4

TENTATIVE RULING

Cross-Defendant (in pro per) MERLYN GUEVARRA’s unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment is GRANTED. CCP § 473(b).

Defendant GUEVARRA’s Proposed Answer separately lodged from the Moving Papers is NOT DEEMED SERVED AND FILED as of the date of the Court’s issuance of this Order. Cross-Defendant GUEVARRA is ORDERED to FILE and SERVE his Answer no later than 5 Court days from the Court’s issuance of this Order.

Moving Party to give notice.

No Opposition filed as of October 26, 2020. Due by October 16, 2020. (CCP §1005(b).)

All parties are ORDERED to appear for the Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for January 14, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept. SE-F.

Under CCP § 473(b), “[t]he court may…relieve a party or [his] legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” The policy of hearing cases on their merits is well-established. (See, e.g. Berman v. Klassman (1971) 17 Cal.App.3d 900.) The Court finds the Declaration of Merlyn Guevarra sufficient to warrant to relief. The Court finds adequate grounds to allow Merlyn Guevarra the opportunity to defend himself on the merits of this action. Cross-Defendant MERLYN GUEVARRA’s unopposed motion to vacate entry of default and default judgment is granted.