Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 00:03:48 (UTC).

MAX YANG, ET AL VS. MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2016 MAX YANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5459

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TRINITY FORCE INTERNATIONAL A CA. CORP.

YANG MAX AN INDIVIDUAL

YANG MAX

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CA. LTD LIABILITY

Not Classified By Court

THE WALKER LAW FIRM

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

GUERRA SANDRA

HICKS KRISTINE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VINCENT W. DAVIS & ASSOC.

WALKER JOSEPH ARTHUR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENBAUM MARK J

WOLF RIFKIN & SHAPIRO

Other Attorneys

WALKER LAW FIRM THE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2016: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERV

7/1/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERV

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/31/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE

9/14/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

10/13/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Summons

11/8/2016: Summons

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-06-16 00:00:00

6/16/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-06-16 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

6/23/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

7/11/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

7/19/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

4/23/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Brief

4/23/2018: Brief

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/24/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION

4/24/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-24 00:00:00

4/24/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-24 00:00:00

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

5/31/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL

2/21/2020: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC, a Ca. Ltd Liability (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER); Filed by Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC, a Ca. Ltd Liability (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketOrder (ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES AND COSTS); Filed by Trinity Force International, a Ca. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (amended of continuance of motion for attorney's fees and costs on appeal and post-judgment); Filed by Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC, a Ca. Ltd Liability (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Appeal and Post-Judgment); Filed by Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC, a Ca. Ltd Liability (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
239 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Trinity Force International, a Ca. Corp. (Plaintiff); Max, Yang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC065459    Hearing Date: August 21, 2020    Dept: E

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES

[CCP §1033.5(c)(5), Civil Code § 1717]

Date: 8/21/20 (8:30 AM)

Case: Max Yang v. Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC (EC065459)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant and Cross-Complainant Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC’s UNOPPOSED Motion for Attorney’s Fees is GRANTED.

The Court finds that Monrovia-Myrtle is the prevailing party in the appeal, and that the matter arose out of a written agreement between the parties which provides that the prevailing party shall be entitled to reasonable attorney’s fees. (Rosenbaum Decl. ¶ 4 & Ex. A at pp. 22-23.) Further the Court finds that the requested attorney’s fees and costs are reasonable. (See Rosenbaum Decl. ¶¶ 22-23 & Exs. E & F.) Accordingly, the Court awards $26,625.00 in attorney’s fees and $289.82 in costs, for a total of $26,914.82 in favor of defendant and cross-complainant Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC and against plaintiff and cross-defendant Max Yang.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant