This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:43:04 (UTC).

MAURICIO CABRAL SALAS VS. CUSTOM GOODS, LLC, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 01/24/2013 MAURICIO CABRAL SALAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CUSTOM GOODS, LLC, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7254

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRAL SALAS MAURICIO

Defendants

CUSTOM GOODS LLC

DOES 1 TO 30

Cross Defendant

SIMPLE STAFFING INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DWYER CHRISTOPHER E. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

VANIS RICHARD W. JR.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/28/2014: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

Minute Order

9/24/2013: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/16/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

6/11/2013: Unknown

DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF JEAN LANTZ IN SUPPORT

8/26/2013: DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF JEAN LANTZ IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/8/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/22/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

10/10/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION OF JEAN E. LANTZ IN SUPPORT

8/26/2013: DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION OF JEAN E. LANTZ IN SUPPORT

RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS

9/24/2013: RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? DISCOVERY MOTIONS

11/5/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? DISCOVERY MOTIONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1) EXPRESS INDEMNITY; 2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 3) CONTRIBUTION & EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT; AND 4) DECLARATORY RELIEF

4/24/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1) EXPRESS INDEMNITY; 2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 3) CONTRIBUTION & EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT; AND 4) DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/8/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/24/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/19/2013: Minute Order

SUMMONS

4/24/2013: SUMMONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (w/prej, entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCVOERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Notice of Ruling (ON DENTS. DISCOVERY MOTION; ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Order Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS,SET ONE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES,SET ONE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Default Entered (SIMPLE STAFFING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPRATION ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: SIMPLE STAFFING, INC ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Cross-complaint filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Summons Filed (on cross-complaint ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.