This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:06:47 (UTC).

MAUREEN RUSH, ET AL. VS. PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 MAUREEN RUSH filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8604

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER HELEN

GEORGE CHELSEA

RUSH MAUREEN

GOOSBY ATTALLA

Defendants

PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP

PREMIER B.H. INC

TERRACINA POST ACUTE

LAUREL AVENUE LLC

PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER

DOES 1-100

MADISON CREEK PARTNERS LLC

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOBATI REZA

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON WILLIAM C.

GITTLER & BRADFORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (OSC RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B)) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Notice of Continuance (OF POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Notice-Settlement (UNCONDITIONAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR ELDER ABUSE AND NEGLECT AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR ELDER ABUSE AND NEGLECT (ONLY) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Notice of Ruling (REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF THE POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status (**PER STIP/ORDER, CONTINUE TO 10/27/17**) - Advanced to this date & continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Order (ORDER TO ADVANCE AND CONTINUE THE POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address (EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY NEW ADDRESS OF COUNSE FOR DEFT. PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP & PREMIER BH INC. IS: GITLER & BRADFORD, 10537 SANTA MONICA BLVD., THIRD FLOOR LA90025); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (DEFENDANTS, PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, L.P., AND PREMIER B.H., INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Acknowlgmt of Receipt (PARTY SERVED: LAUREL AVENUE, LLC DBA TERRACINA POST ACUTE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Acknowlgmt of Receipt (PARTY SERVED: PREMIER B.H., INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Acknowlgmt of Receipt (PARTY SERVED: PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Declaration (OF HELEN ALEXANDER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32 AND WELFARE & INSTITUTIONS CODE 15657.3 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less