This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 13:00:43 (UTC).

MATTHEW SMITH VS EMILY HAMPSHIRE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2015 MATTHEW SMITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EMILY HAMPSHIRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NELSON, MAREN E. and NELSON, MAREN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4353

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NELSON, MAREN E.

NELSON, MAREN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH MATTHEW

Respondent

HAMPSHIRE EMILY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2015
  • Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hampshire, Emily ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Declaration - Default FL170

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Smith, Matthew ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons (Personal )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Request - Enter Default FL165

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Nelson, Maren, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 04-30-15 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (NO PROOF OF SERVICE )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Smith, Matthew ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Smith, Matthew ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less