This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 11:10:57 (UTC).

MATTHEW CROCKER VS THE DRESDEN RESTAURANT ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2012 MATTHEW CROCKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE DRESDEN RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8249

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CROCKER MATTHEW

Defendants and Respondents

BREWER RICHARD

DRESDEN RESTAURANT THE

FERRARO JAMES

FERRARO TRUST THE

IKEDA MIHO

DOES 1-25

DRESDEN RESTAURANT THE (INCORRECT NAME)

RITTO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCHIMMEL ALAN I. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HESS MATTHEW E.

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

Other Attorneys

SCHMITT CHARLES J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND. AUTHORITIES

3/26/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND. AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

3/26/2012: NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/15/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/18/2012: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT MATTHEW CROCKER?S REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

6/22/2012: CROSS-DEFENDANT MATTHEW CROCKER?S REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/26/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/26/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

11/27/2012: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO RITTO, INC.; JAMES FERRARO, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE FERRARO TRUST DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

11/27/2012: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO RITTO, INC.; JAMES FERRARO, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE FERRARO TRUST DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND DECLARATION AS TO LATE SERVICE OF OPPOSITION.

12/4/2012: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND DECLARATION AS TO LATE SERVICE OF OPPOSITION.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

3/14/2013: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 581(T)(1) UPON SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS DER%IURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

4/15/2013: ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 581(T)(1) UPON SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS DER%IURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

APPELLANT?S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

5/14/2013: APPELLANT?S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/23/2013: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE PENDING APPEAL ETC...

6/5/2013: UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE PENDING APPEAL ETC...

PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO TAX COSTS

7/8/2013: PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO TAX COSTS

Minute Order -

9/3/2013: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/22/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by RITTO, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; (Mandatory Case Review Hearing; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketAMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • DocketREMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Matthew Crocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Matthew Crocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Matthew Crocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew Crocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

r ’

Alan L. Schimmel, Esq. SBN 101328 FILED

Michael W. Parks, Esq. SBN 154531 SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA Stacey R. Cutting, Esq. SBN 265993 COUNTYOFLOS ANGELES

SCHIMMEL & PARKS CMAY 14 2043

15303 Ventura Blvd., Suite 650 Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 Telephone: 818.464.5061/Facsimile: 818.464.5091

Attorneys for Plaintiff MATTHEW CROCKER

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MATTHEW CROCKER, an individual, Case No. BC478249

[Assigned to Dept. 14, Hon. Terry A. Green)] Plaintiff, | Vs. NOTICE OF ORDER, JUDGMENT AND

ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

THE DRESDEN RESTAURANT; THE FERRARO TRUST; JAMES FERRARO, an individual; RICHARD BREWER, an individual; MIHO IKEDA, an individual; and DOES 1-25

inclusive | Defendants. DATE: None DEPT.: 14 JUDGE: Hon. Terry A. Green RICHARD BREWER and MIHO IKEDA, Cross-Complainants, FILED: February 2, 2012 FSC: August 12, 2013 vs. TRIAL: August 26, 2013

MATTHEW CROCKER and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive,

Cross-Defendants.

N’N’N

TO ALL INTERESTED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the Hon. Terry A. Green on the above-captioned matter has signed the order and judgment/entry of judgment in relation to The Dresden Restaurant, et al.’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Second Amended Complaint.

_— e NOTICE OF ORDER, JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER