This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:29:27 (UTC).

MATSAMURA, ANGELICA VS MATSAMURA, EMMANUEL V

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 MATSAMURA, ANGELICA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MATSAMURA, EMMANUEL V. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3565

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATSAMURA ANGELICA

Respondent

MATSAMURA EMMANUEL V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail (FL141 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (REJECT ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons by Posting (fl311 fl105 fl150 fl160 fl140 service was by publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 01-12-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica - Denied on 2016-09-29 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matsamura, Angelica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.