This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 19:48:52 (UTC).

MATHEW CULLEN ET AL VS CHRISTOPHER S HANLEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2015 MATHEW CULLEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER S HANLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, ROBERT L. HESS and H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4640

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

ROBERT L. HESS

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CULLEN MATHEW

MOTION THEORY INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-50

GERTNER JORDEN DEREK

HANLEY CHRISTOPHER S.

HERO ENTERTAINMENT

MUSE PRODUCTIONS INC.

NICOLA SIX LIMITED

NICOLA SIX PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

MUSE PRODUCTION INC.

HANLEY CHISTOPHER S.

Cross Defendant

MIRADA STUDIOS

Other

GREENBERG & TRAURIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VENABLE LLP

WEINGARTEN ALEX M.

WEINGARTEN ALEX M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEOPOLD PERICH & SMITH P.C.

SCHILKEN ELIZABETH

LEOPOLD PETRICH AND SMITH

SCHILKEN ELIZABETH L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEOPOLD PETRICH AND SMITH

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

8/12/2016: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/19/2016: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-08-26 00:00:00

8/26/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-08-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

11/21/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-11-21 00:00:00

11/21/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-11-21 00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

11/22/2016: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

12/5/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Notice of Related Case

12/5/2016: Notice of Related Case

Association of Attorney

12/13/2016: Association of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00

1/12/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

1/17/2017: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

3/22/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-04-06 00:00:00

4/6/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-04-06 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion

6/1/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion

Case Management Statement

8/14/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-08-24 00:00:00

8/24/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-08-24 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

10/12/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/20/2017: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion - Other (.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mathew Cullen (Plaintiff); Motion Theory, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Chistopher S. Hanley (Defendant); Muse Productions, Inc. (Defendant); Jorden Derek Gertner (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Chistopher S. Hanley (Defendant); Muse Productions, Inc. (Defendant); Jorden Derek Gertner (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (in support of defendants motion for summary judgment); Filed by Chistopher S. Hanley (Defendant); Muse Productions, Inc. (Defendant); Jorden Derek Gertner (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Court Order - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-10-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mathew Cullen (Plaintiff); Motion Theory, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. FRAUD; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nicola Six Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Motion Theory Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant