This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2016 at 01:55:33 (UTC).

MASIS NAZARYAN VS C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2008 MASIS NAZARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH DE VANON, CAROLYN KUHL, C. EDWARD SIMPSON, J. STEPHEN CZULEGER, JAN A. PLUIM and LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2686

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH DE VANON

CAROLYN KUHL

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

J. STEPHEN CZULEGER

JAN A. PLUIM

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

NAZARYAN MASIS

NAZARYAN JENEK

Respondents and Defendants

EMERSON MOTOR COMPANY

HOTSY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

SUNTEC INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED

HOTSY CORPORATION/HOTSY CLEANING SYSTEMS

ENVIRONMENTAL EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC

ENVIROMENTAL EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC. DBA

DON ARMSTRONG

HOTSY CORPORATION

A & A CLEANING SYSTEMS

SUNTEC INDUSTRIES INC.

FRANCE/SCOTT FETZER COMPANY

EMERSON ELECTRIC COMPANY

C-TECH INDUSTRIES INC.

A&A CLEANING SYSTEMS

C-TECH INDUSTIRES INC. DBA HOTSY CORP/

WAYNE/SCOTT FETZER COMPANY

FRANC COMPANY

ENVIRONMENTAL EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FITZPATRICK PETER V. ESQ.

MARDIROSSIAN GARO ESQ.

MARDIROSSIAN & ASSOCIATES

MARDIROSSIAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LECK ROBERT BURNS III

MARTINEZ JORGE A. ESQ

FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & KLEIN LLP

HEFFERNAN KEVIN N. ESQ.

HENNELLY & GROSSFELD LLP

LECK & ASSOCIATES

MARTIN PAUL T. ESQ

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

SNELL & WILMER L.L.P.

TAYLOR KEVIN S.

TAYLOR/ANDERSON LLC

TAYLOR|ANDERSON LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/3/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/19/2012: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/15/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

11/30/2012: Minute Order

JOINT REPORT TO COURT RE MOTIONS INLIMINE

12/7/2012: JOINT REPORT TO COURT RE MOTIONS INLIMINE

STIPULATION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL AND ORDER THEREON

12/12/2012: STIPULATION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL AND ORDER THEREON

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE

1/4/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order

1/7/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING ON C-TECH?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND DEPOSITION

1/8/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING ON C-TECH?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF?S INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND DEPOSITION

ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF BRENT ANDERSON

1/9/2013: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF BRENT ANDERSON

DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.S SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTING OF THE SUBJECT PRESSURE WASHER THAT IS NOT SUBSTANTIALLY SIMILAR TO THE OPERA

1/10/2013: DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.S SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTING OF THE SUBJECT PRESSURE WASHER THAT IS NOT SUBSTANTIALLY SIMILAR TO THE OPERA

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

1/11/2013: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

1/11/2013: Minute Order

STIPULATION TO PRE-SCREEN JURORS DUE TO COURT STIPULATED HARDSHIP

1/11/2013: STIPULATION TO PRE-SCREEN JURORS DUE TO COURT STIPULATED HARDSHIP

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MASTS NAZARYAN?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION, AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION -

1/14/2013: NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MASTS NAZARYAN?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION, AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION -

DECLARATION OF JORGE A. MARTINNEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MASIS NAZARYAN?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION, AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM

1/14/2013: DECLARATION OF JORGE A. MARTINNEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MASIS NAZARYAN?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION, AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM

DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MASIS NAZARYAN?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORI

1/14/2013: DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MASIS NAZARYAN?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORI

DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT O.F PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION

1/14/2013: DEFENDANT C-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT O.F PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL?S DEPOSITION, INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION AND INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2013
  • Receipt (DAILY JURY FEE FOR 3/13/13 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Statement of Case (PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT STATUS REPORT; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (PLNTS. STATEMENT OF THE CASE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Response (MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MEMORANDUM PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 1/11/13 RE: MODIFICATIONS TO PRESSURE WASHER THAT CONT. TO THE INCIDENT (PLTF'S MIL #3) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Response (MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MEMORANDUM PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 1/11/13 RE CAL-OSHA REGULATIONS TO BE INTRODUCED AT TRIAL (PLTF'S MIL # 1 & 2) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • Stip & Order-use CSR (LISA MOSKOWITZ, CSR #10816 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • Memorandum - Other Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2008
  • Notice (of OSC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • Amendment to Complaint (Doe 1 Stahl/Scott Fetzer Company ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2008
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK PETER V.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARDIROSSIAN GARO ESQ.