Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2020 at 01:10:18 (UTC).

MARY LOU VIDERGAR ET AL VS ALFA LAVAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2008 MARY LOU VIDERGAR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALFA LAVAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JERRY K. FIELDS, ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE and AURELIO MUNOZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4417

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JERRY K. FIELDS

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

AURELIO MUNOZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUCAS LISA VIDERGAR

VIDERGAR FRANK JR.

VIDERGAR MARY LOU

Defendants and Respondents

ALFA LAVAL INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

ATWOOD & MORRILL

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC.

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC. INC.

BUFFALO PUMPS INC.

BW/IP INC.

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

CHRYSLER L.L.C.

CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION

COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

DANA COMPANIES L.L.C.

DAP INC.

DOES 1-450

ELLIOTT COMPANY

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDDINS RON C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LOW BALL & LYNCH

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

JACKSON GABRIEL A. ESQ.

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

BASSI MARTINI EDLIN & BLUM LLP

K&L GATES LLP

KNOTT & GLAZIER LLP

PERKINS COIE LLP

POND NORTH LLP

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

BECHERER KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

GORDON & REES LLP

BOOTH MITCHEL & STRANGE LLP

7 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,332 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crane Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 48; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff); Lisa Vidergar Lucas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mary Lou Vidergar (Plaintiff); Frank, Jr. Vidergar (Plaintiff); Lisa Vidergar Lucas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND A SURVIVAL ACTION - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ATWOOD & MORRILL is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant