This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 15:30:30 (UTC).

MARY BAUMANN ET AL VS ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2013 MARY BAUMANN filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7213

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AHRNS SANDRA

BAUMANN MARY

Defendants and Respondents

CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN

DOES 1-120

ENSIGN GROUP INC. THE

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOCKINGTON MARY E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LONGO DAN L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STATUTORY ELDER/NEGLECT; ETC

4/29/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STATUTORY ELDER/NEGLECT; ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/30/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

IROOFOFSEKICE S(?N4OR4S & COMI?LAI[

6/14/2013: IROOFOFSEKICE S(?N4OR4S & COMI?LAI[

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE; EXHIBITS

7/18/2013: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE; EXHIBITS

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/16/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

8/29/2013: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36 AND APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL; ETC

9/3/2013: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36 AND APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL; ETC

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THE ENSIGN GROUP AND ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST, LLC?S DEMURRER

9/16/2013: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THE ENSIGN GROUP AND ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST, LLC?S DEMURRER

DEFENDANT CARE P? HEALTH PLAN, INC.?S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

9/19/2013: DEFENDANT CARE P? HEALTH PLAN, INC.?S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

DECLARATION OF DOCTOR AN WAR 4.RASTU IN SUPPORT OF TRIAL PREFERENCE

9/19/2013: DECLARATION OF DOCTOR AN WAR 4.RASTU IN SUPPORT OF TRIAL PREFERENCE

PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN INC.?S OPPOSITION AND OBJECTION TO APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF SANDRA AHRN?S FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/19/2013: PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN INC.?S OPPOSITION AND OBJECTION TO APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF SANDRA AHRN?S FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO ?PLANTIFFS?OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THE ENGN GROUP. AND ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC?S DEMURRER?

9/19/2013: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO ?PLANTIFFS?OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THE ENGN GROUP. AND ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC?S DEMURRER?

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

9/26/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

Minute Order -

9/26/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/3/2013: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING SANDRA AHRNS TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION BEFORE THE OCTOBER 28, 2013 MEDIATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $960; DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA A. PALIN I

10/3/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING SANDRA AHRNS TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION BEFORE THE OCTOBER 28, 2013 MEDIATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $960; DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA A. PALIN I

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/18/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

1/8/2014: Minute Order -

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PRFERENCE) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (For Mary Baumann ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv (ALL DEFENDANTS) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARY BAUMANN ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR MARY BAUMANN GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant