This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 20:04:53 (UTC).

MARY ANN DURNING VS. THE WILSHIRE-WESTHOLME HOA,INC.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2013 MARY ANN DURNING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE WILSHIRE-WESTHOLME HOA,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD A. STONE and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0887

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD A. STONE

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DURNING MARY ANN

MARY ANN DURNING 2010 TRUST

Defendants

WILSHIRE

THE WILSHIRE-WESTHOLME HOMEOWNERS ASSO.

Trustee

GREGORY ANITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERMAN LAURENCE M.

THOMAS WENDY M.

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (APPOINTING ANITA GREGORY AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARY ANN DURNING; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Opposition (TO MTN TO COMPEL PROD OF ROTHCHILD FILE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 23 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 22 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Exhibit List (THIRD AMENDED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE N. 21 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Opposition (TO RENEWED M,TN TO BIFURCUATE ISSUES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Declaration (OF WENDY M. THOMAS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Stip & Order-use CSR (KIMBERLY THOMPSON CSR #13212 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR ORDER APPOINTING A GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF PURS.TO CCP 372 AND 373 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2013
  • Order (FOR PREFERENCE; TRIAL CONT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Notice of Motion (FOR PREFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Ex-Parte Application (for an order shortening time to set a Motion for preference ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Order (Granting ex parte application is signed by; RICHARD A. STONE, JUDGE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • Answer (AS TO WILSHIRE-WESTHOLME HOME- OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE LAW OFFICE is a litigant