This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2021 at 14:30:34 (UTC).

MARTY LAT ET AL VS FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2013 MARTY LAT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8211

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

LAT MARTY

LAT MIKEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

SORIANO ARNEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KANTOR & KANTOR LLP

KANTOR GLENN R.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

OAKES ROYAL F. ESQ.

ZIMET MARC J. ESQ.

ZIMET MARC JOSEPH ESQ.

OAKES ROYAL FOREST ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed - Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed B282008

1/28/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed - Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed B282008

Request for Dismissal

9/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION FOR...)

10/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION FOR...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/4/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON THE PARTIES' CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND OF STATUS CONFERENCE

12/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON THE PARTIES' CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS) OF 02/26/2020

2/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS) OF 02/26/2020

DEFENDANT ARNEL SORIANO?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO MARTY LAT AND MIKEL LAT?S COMPLAINT

2/13/2014: DEFENDANT ARNEL SORIANO?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO MARTY LAT AND MIKEL LAT?S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/15/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DEFENDANT ARNEL SORIANO?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO MARTY LAT AND MIKEL LAT?S COMPLAINT

4/23/2014: DEFENDANT ARNEL SORIANO?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO MARTY LAT AND MIKEL LAT?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/23/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ARNEL SORIALNO?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/16/2014: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ARNEL SORIALNO?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/18/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

9/11/2014: Minute Order -

ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

9/25/2014: ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

NOTICE OF RULING AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

7/21/2015: NOTICE OF RULING AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF MARTY LAT

9/27/2016: DECLARATION OF MARTY LAT

Minute Order -

5/15/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND OBJECTIONS

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND OBJECTIONS

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified (NOA:04/13/20 -U2 B305755); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:4/13/20; "U2"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("U2"); Filed by Marty Lat (Appellant); Mikel Lat (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal); Filed by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U2"); Filed by Marty Lat (Appellant); Mikel Lat (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 3:54 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketJudgment (of Dismissal); Filed by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
325 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURTS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANT FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marty Lat (Plaintiff); Mikel Lat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AGAINST FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR: 1: BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marty Lat (Plaintiff); Mikel Lat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC528211    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 19

The Plaintiff Marty Lat's Motion for Summary Adjudication and Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudication are CONTINUED TO February 3, 2020, 8:30 a.m. The Court needs additional time to consider the briefing filed and issues presented.

The Status Conference is also continued to that date and time.

Counsel for Defendant to give notice.   

Please Note: If counsel have a conflict with the new date selected by the Court, please contact the staff in Department 19 to arrange for another date.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS NEW WORLD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A WASHINGTON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMET MARC JOSEPH