This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 11:50:55 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, ANA A VS CHAVEZ, MARTIN M

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 MARTINEZ, ANA A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHAVEZ, MARTIN M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4059

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTINEZ ANA ARACELI

Respondent

CHAVEZ MARTIN MARTINEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Held - Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Request - Default Setting; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Proof of Service (01/31/2017 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 02-02-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (01/31/2017 -Waived ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Property Declaration (Separate prop decl - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Property Declaration (comm and quasi comm prop decl - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martinez, Ana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (12/06/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (12/06/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Notice (of case assignment - F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (12/06/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.