This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 03:32:27 (UTC).

MARTIN WOLF ET AL VS EDWIN MOVAGHARIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 MARTIN WOLF filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EDWIN MOVAGHARIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1097

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GERVASI LESLEY

GERVASI VINCENT

WOLF MARTIN

WOLF WENDY

Respondents and Defendants

MOVAGHARIAN EDWIN

ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINAN-

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEVITT LAW APC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/14/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/27/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/13/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/13/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY DEFENDANT MOVAGHARIAN; ETC.

7/21/2016: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY DEFENDANT MOVAGHARIAN; ETC.

Minute Order

7/20/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

7/12/2016: Unknown

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/9/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/5/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/22/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

3/1/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF TRUST DEED

2/19/2016: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF TRUST DEED

SUMMONS

2/19/2016: SUMMONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Martin Wolf (Plaintiff); Wendy Wolf (Plaintiff); Vincent Gervasi (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY DEFENDANT MOVAGHARIAN; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Martin Wolf (Plaintiff); Wendy Wolf (Plaintiff); Vincent Gervasi (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF TRUST DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant