This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:31:27 (UTC).

MARTIN QUIJANO VS NATTALIE TEHRANI

Case Summary

On 04/19/2011 MARTIN QUIJANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATTALIE TEHRANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN and MEYERS, PATRICK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8550

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

MEYERS, PATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUIJANO MARTIN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CORONADO ALEXANDRIA

MORAN BRYAN

MORAN BRYON

TEHRANI KAMRAN

TEHRANI NATTALIE

TEHRANI NAZANIN

Not Classified By Court

POSNER GAYLE

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGLUND JOHNSON & SOMMER

Defendant Attorneys

CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS LAW OFFICES OF

EARLY MASLACH & VAN O'SHEA

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BASH & POLYACHENKO PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALPER M/O 06-25-12need dismissal of entire crosscomplaint filed 12/11/11) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • DocketOrd of Disml for Settled Case; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • DocketOrd of Disml for Settled Case (PER CCP SECTION 664.6; W/O PREJ SEE 8/27/12 SIGNED M/O ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 9/22/11 BY BRYAN MORAN ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; X-C FILED 7/5/11 BY ALEXANDRIA CORONADO; ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; X-C FILED 9/22/11 BY BRYAN MORAN ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO NATTALIE TEHRANI ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO NAZANIN TEHRANI ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO ALEXANDRIA CORONADO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARTIN QUIJANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less