This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 09:14:16 (UTC).

MARTIN CADILLAC COMPANY, INC. VS JONATHAN GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 MARTIN CADILLAC COMPANY, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JONATHAN GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3608

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

MARTIN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP

MARTIN CADILLAC COMPANY INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

GUTIERREZ JONATHAN

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BECK AND BROWNING

BECK ROBERT W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKMAN JOHN J. ESQ.

JACKMAN JOHN J.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BECK ROBERT W.

Other Attorneys

THOMPSON ROBERT WALTER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE

12/10/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/5/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO INDEMNIFY LAB. COD. ? 2802 2. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES FOR ALL REGULAR HOURS WORKED; ETC

2/11/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO INDEMNIFY LAB. COD. ? 2802 2. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES FOR ALL REGULAR HOURS WORKED; ETC

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

8/2/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

8/2/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

4/27/2017: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Minute Order

5/5/2017: Minute Order

EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUGMENT ON STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

5/5/2017: EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUGMENT ON STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/8/2017: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

JOHN J. JACKMAN'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

7/6/2017: JOHN J. JACKMAN'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/6/2017: DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/6/2017: DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. BECK IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. BECK IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. BECK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/12/2017: DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. BECK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order

7/18/2017: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

7/18/2017: ORDER TRANSFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Robert W. Beck (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Jonathan Gutierrez (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Jury Trial; Final Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Exhibit List; Filed by MARTIN CADILLAC COMPANY, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Witness List; Filed by MARTIN CADILLAC COMPANY, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Jury Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO INDEMNIFY LAB. COD. 2802 2. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES FOR ALL REGULAR HOURS WORKED; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MARTIN CADILLAC COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON ROBERT WALTER