This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 15:12:46 (UTC).

MARTHA SANDOVAL VS PARKING CONCEPTS INC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 MARTHA SANDOVAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PARKING CONCEPTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU and MARY ANN MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4064

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

MARY ANN MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SANDOVAL MARTHA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

PARKING CONCEPTS INC.

TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KARLIN & KARLIN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REILLY THOMAS H.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

3/27/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME, LABOR CODE ? 204 AND 510; ETC

3/27/2013: COMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME, LABOR CODE ? 204 AND 510; ETC

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

3/29/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/2/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/2/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

4/3/2013: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (1Z1J4)

5/15/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (1Z1J4)

NOTTCF. TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

5/17/2013: NOTTCF. TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/22/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR REMAND

7/18/2013: ORDER FOR REMAND

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/25/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/26/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/26/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/14/2013: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

8/20/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/22/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketWrit issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 25; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 25; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Parking Concepts, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 25; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Martha Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME, LABOR CODE 204 AND 510; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS is a litigant

Latest cases where PARKING CONCEPTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REILLY, THOMAS H