This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 01:12:22 (UTC).

MARTA LUNA ET AL VS BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION E

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 MARTA LUNA filed an Other lawsuit against BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8136

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LUNA REFUGIO

LUNA MARTA

Defendants and Respondents

BEVERLY HOSPITAL

LUNA MICHELLE A. RN PHD CPHQ

SARKAR SOUMITRA M.D.

MEHTA KRUNAL J. M.D.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

RAMBHATLA KAMALAKAR S. M.D.

BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION

KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY

AZAULA MELINDA RN

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC.

AZAULA RN MELINDA

RAMBHATLA M.D. KAMALAKAR

SARKAR M.D. SOUMITRA

METH M.D. KRUNDAL J.

LUNA R.N. PHD CPHQ. MICHELLE A.

Decedent

LUNA DOLORES

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHISVIN CRAIG L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DOYLE DANIEL W. ESQ.

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F. ESQ.

PACKER ROBERT B. ESQ.

SCHMID & VOILES

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF SOUMITRA SAICAR, M.D. AND KRUNAL J.MEHTA, M.D. AGAINST PLAINTIFFS MARTA LUNA AND REFUGIO LUNA

12/27/2017: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF SOUMITRA SAICAR, M.D. AND KRUNAL J.MEHTA, M.D. AGAINST PLAINTIFFS MARTA LUNA AND REFUGIO LUNA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS SOUMITRA SAKAR, M.D. AND KRUNAL J. MEHTA, M.D. AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS MARTA LUNA AND REFUGIO LUNA

1/2/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS SOUMITRA SAKAR, M.D. AND KRUNAL J. MEHTA, M.D. AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS MARTA LUNA AND REFUGIO LUNA

Unknown

5/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/24/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/4/2018: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

10/21/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

SUMMONS

10/21/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/2/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/2/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/2/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/2/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ERROR

11/10/2016: ERROR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

11/10/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Order; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (Order to Show Cause; Not held) -

    Read MoreRead Less
445 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marta Luna (Plaintiff); Refugio Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marta Luna (Plaintiff); Refugio Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Marta Luna (Plaintiff); Refugio Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Opposition Document (TOMTN TO COMPEL RESPONSES FROM DOLORESLUNA TO DEMAND FOR PROD OF DOCS, SET ONE; HEARING SET FOR 3-29-17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Marta Luna (Plaintiff); Refugio Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION is a litigant