This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:02:04 (UTC).

MARK HABIBI VS PROVENZA FLOORS, INC. ET. AL.,

Case Summary

On 12/02/2015 MARK HABIBI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROVENZA FLOORS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5058

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HABIBI MARK

Defendants

PROVENZA FLOORS INC.

PROSOURCE WHOLESALE FLOORCOVERING

TRI-WEST LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANOUCHEHRI SAHM

Defendant Attorneys

MIRHOSSEINI ALI

RAVID LAW GROUP

LAW NEWFIELD

MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES

NEWFIELD LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (With prejudice Entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Mark Habibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; OtherSee Memo Box below) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • at 09:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Jury Trial (2. FSC(FSC/JT NOT HELD. CASE SETTLED.OSC RE DISM SET.)) - Other: See Memo Box below

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Mark Habibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; (Trial; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • at 09:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Trial ((COURT TRIAL, 3 DAYS)-FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) - Continued by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tri-West, LTD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Mark Habibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Provenza Floors, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Provenza Floors, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Mark Habibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Provenza Floors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRHOSSEINI ALI R.