This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 00:03:57 (UTC).

MARK CHATFIELD ET AL VS KATHYRN AXELROD ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2016 MARK CHATFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KATHYRN AXELROD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3386

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHATFIELD MARK

DURAN DOREEN

Defendants and Respondents

ALVARADO LOUIE

ANDRADE JOHN

RAMIREZ ENRIQUE

AXELROD KATHYRN

DOES 1 TO 20

ANDRADE EUGENIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SIAS/CARR LLP

CARR PETER LAURENCE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS MARK CHATFIELD AND DOREEN DURAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE OR VACATE DISMISSAL; DECLARATION OF PETER L. CARR IV

1/3/2018: PLAINTIFFS MARK CHATFIELD AND DOREEN DURAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE OR VACATE DISMISSAL; DECLARATION OF PETER L. CARR IV

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

1/26/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/2/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/16/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/15/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/15/2019: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/14/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

3/16/2016: SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/28/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/14/2017: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS MARK CHATFIELD AND DOREEN DURAN'S EX FARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE OR VACATING DISMISSAL; ETC

12/12/2017: PLAINTIFFS MARK CHATFIELD AND DOREEN DURAN'S EX FARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE OR VACATING DISMISSAL; ETC

Minute Order

12/12/2017: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Counsel Should Not Be Sanctioned for Failure to Comply With California Rules of Court Section 3.110(b)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Coun...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Coun...) of 03/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Chatfield (Plaintiff); Doreen Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Mark Chatfield (Plaintiff); Doreen Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Mark Chatfield (Plaintiff); Doreen Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC613386    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARK CHATFIELD, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

KATHRYN AXELROD, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC613386

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 6, 2020

Plaintiffs, Mark Chatfield and Doreen Duran filed this action against Defendants, Kathryn Axelrod, John Andrade, Eugenia Andrade, Louis Alvarado, and Enrique Ramirez for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 3/14/16. On 8/28/17, the Court called the matter for an FSC, and on 9/14/17, the Court called the matter for trial; no party appeared on either date, and on 9/14/17, the Court dismissed the case.

On 1/26/18, the Court granted Plaintiff’s motion to vacate the dismissal. Thereafter, the Court continued OSCs re: dismissal on numerous occasions. On 3/15/19, because Plaintiffs failed to appear at the OSC re: dismissal, the Court dismissed the case.

On 11/25/19, Plaintiffs filed this motion to vacate the dismissal. Plaintiffs move to vacate the dismissal per CCP §473(b). §473(b) requires the moving papers to be filed no more than six months after entry of dismissal. Six months after 3/15/19 fell on or about 9/15/19. Plaintiffs filed this motion more than two months too late, and the motion is accordingly denied. Notably, the six-month limit is jurisdictional in the sense that the court has no power to grant relief after this time regardless of whether an “attorney affidavit of fault” is filed or how reasonable the excuse for the delay. Austin v. Los Angeles Unified School Dist. (2016) 244 Cal.App.4th 918, 928.

No defendant in this action has appeared, and therefore no notice is necessary.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.